US HB3281 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deceptive Practices and Voter Intimidation Prevention Act of 2019 This bill generally prohibits deceptive practices, false statements, and voter interference regarding federal elections. Specifically, the bill prohibits any person, within 60 days before an election, from communicating, causing to be communicated, or producing for communication certain information on voting, if the person (1) knows such information to be materially false, and (2) has the intent to impede or prevent another person from exercising the right to vote in an election.The bill also prohibits false statements regarding public endorsements and hindering, interfering with, or preventing voting or registering to vote. A private right of action for preventive relief is established for persons aggrieved by violations of these prohibitions. Criminal penalties are also established for violations. If the Department of Justice (DOJ) receives a credible report that materially false information has been or is being communicated in violation of these prohibitions, DOJ must communicate to the public accurate information designed to correct the materially false information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deceptive Practices and Voter Intimidation Prevention Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1834 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR650 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback