US HB3294 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUBZone Unification and Business Stability Act of 2017
Title
HUBZone Unification and Business Stability Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB2013 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2592 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB690 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
HB2013 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2592 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB690 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Government information and archives
Military facilities and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Commerce
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Government information and archives
Military facilities and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3294/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3294/BILLS-115hr3294ih.pdf |