US HB3294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to permit legally married same sex couples to amend their tax returns to file as married filing jointly for returns outside of the statute of limitations.
Title
Refund Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1244 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1940 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1940 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3294/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3294/BILLS-116hr3294ih.pdf |