US HB3327 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jack Alderson Toxic Exposure Declassification Act
Title
Jack Alderson Toxic Exposure Declassification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
SB726 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB726 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Disability and paralysis
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3327/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3327/BILLS-115hr3327ih.pdf |