US HB3327 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services rule titled "Medicare and Medicaid Programs; Regulation to Require Drug Pricing Transparency," published on May 10, 2019. The rule requires direct-to-consumer television advertisements for covered drugs and biologics under Medicare and Medicaid to include the list price of a 30-day supply or for a typical course of treatment, if the list price is at least $35 per month. The rule takes effect July 9, 2019.
Title
Drug Price Transparency for Medicare Patients Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Government information and archives
Health
Inflation and prices
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Government information and archives
Health
Inflation and prices
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3327/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3327/BILLS-116hr3327ih.pdf |