US HB3342 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sanctioning Hizballah's Illicit Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act (Sec. 2) This bill states that it shall be U.S. policy to condemn the use of innocent civilians as human shields. (Sec. 3) The President shall submit to Congress within one year, and annually thereafter, a list of: each foreign person that is a member of Hizballah or Hamas or is knowingly acting on behalf of Hizballah or Hamas and knowingly directs the use of civilians protected by the law of war to shield military objectives from attack, and each foreign person or agency or instrumentality of a foreign state that knowingly and materially directs or supports any such act. The President shall impose U.S.-based property-blocking and visa sanctions, including revocation of existing visas, against a listed person, entity, or instrumentality. The President is urged to submit to Congress within one year, and annually thereafter, a list of each foreign person or entity that knowingly directs the use of civilians protected by the law of war to shield military objectives from attack, excluding those foreign persons included in the most recent mandatory sanctions list. (Sec. 5) This bill shall cease to be effective on December 31, 2023.
Title
Sanctioning Hizballah's Illicit Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10078-10079) |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Mr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10078-10079) |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4059 Amendment SA 4059 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4059 Amendment SA 4059 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6881) To amend the title. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4058 Amendment SA 4058 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4058 Amendment SA 4058 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6873-6874) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6881) |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.4047 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-10-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.4046 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-10-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8178-8179) |
2017-10-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3342. |
2017-10-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8178-8183) |
2017-10-25 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 269. |
2017-10-24 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-367, Part I. |
2017-09-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3257 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign property
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Terrorism
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Foreign property
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Terrorism
United Nations
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity