US HB3349 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-248. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-248. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Daughters of the Republic of Texas to establish the Republic of Texas Legation Memorial on federal land in the District of Columbia and its environs to commemorate and honor those individuals who, as representatives of the Republic of Texas, served in the District of Columbia as diplomats to the United States and made possible the annexation of Texas as the 28th state of the United States.
Title
Republic of Texas Legation Memorial Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-248. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7187) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4558) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3349. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4558-4559) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-425. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-12-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4744 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Government trust funds
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Texas
U.S. history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Texas
U.S. history