US HB335 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the South Florida ecosystem. An algal bloom is a rapid growth of algae that may create toxic or hypoxic (severely low-oxygen) conditions that are harmful to humans, animals, aquatic ecosystems, and the economy. The Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia must assess potential approaches to reduce harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the ecosystem. The task force must also submit a plan, based on the assessment, for reducing, mitigating, and controlling harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the region.
Title
South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8010-8011) |
2019-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 335. |
2019-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8010-8013) |
2019-09-26 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 159. |
2019-09-11 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2019-09-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-202, Part I. |
2019-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality