US HB3352 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Department of State Authorization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of State Authorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7412-7434)
2019-07-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3352.
2019-07-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7412-7436)
2019-07-25HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 140.
2019-07-24HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 116-181.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-06-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB193 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB1677 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB2024 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB2046 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
HB2159 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB3639 (Related) 2019-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB3769 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects

Art, artists, authorship
Building construction
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employee leave
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Human rights
Intergovernmental relations
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military facilities and property
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Performance measurement
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Student aid and college costs
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
U.S. and foreign investments
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Women's rights
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback