US HB3360 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the treatment of unaccompanied alien children who are in Federal custody by reason of their immigration status, and for other purposes.
Title
Asylum Reform and Border Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB517 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3857 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3857 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sound recording
Administrative remedies
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sound recording
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3360/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3360/BILLS-116hr3360ih.pdf |