US HB3369 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-2)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To close the GI Bill loophole and update the 80/20 rule for proprietary institutions of higher education.
Title
DAVIE Act Defending All Veterans In Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3179 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB867 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1775 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3322-3323)
SB867 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1775 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3322-3323)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Education
Education programs funding
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Education
Education programs funding
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3369/BILLS-116hr3369ih.pdf |