US HB3387 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking Water System Improvement Act of 2017 This bill amends the Safe Drinking Water Act to provide support for public water systems and promote compliance by the systems with drinking water regulations. The bill expands requirements concerning consumer confidence reports issued by community water systems. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) or a state with primary enforcement authority responsibility under the Act may require the owners or operators of certain public water systems that have repeatedly violated national primary drinking water regulations to consolidate or transfer ownership. The EPA must develop a strategic plan for improving the accuracy and availability of compliance monitoring data. The bill expands risk assessment requirements for community water systems to include risks from natural hazards. The bill creates a grant program within the EPA called the Drinking Water Infrastructure Risk and Resilience Program. The bill: (1) reauthorizes through FY2022 the public water system supervision grant program and the source water petition program, and (2) reauthorizes through FY2022 and revises the drinking water state revolving fund. The bill expands requirements for public water systems to monitor unregulated containments. The EPA must establish a grant program for the replacement of drinking water fountains that contain lead in schools and day care facilities. This bill amends the Emergency Planning and Community Right-To-Know Act of 1986 to ensure that states and community water systems are notified of a release of a contaminant into their source waters.
Title
Drinking Water System Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279. |
2017-11-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-380. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4908 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB3021 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.
SB3021 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Buy American requirements
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Labor standards
Metals
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Water use and supply
Buy American requirements
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Labor standards
Metals
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Water use and supply