US HB3399 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2003 to include California in the program, and for other purposes. This bill reauthorizes through FY2025 and revises the Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2003, which provided grants to Maryland and Louisiana for a program to eradicate or control nutria (a type of rodent). The program also provided grants to restore marshland damaged by nutria. This bill revises the grant program, including by expanding the program to include grants for eradicating nutria in any state that has demonstrated a need for the program as well as grants for restoring wetlands or agricultural lands damaged by nutria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Nutria Eradication and Control Act of 2003 to include California in the program, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2020-02-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1208)
2020-02-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3399.
2020-02-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1208-1210)
2020-02-26HouseMr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-02-25HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 327.
2020-02-25HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-405.
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2020-01-29HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2020-01-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-24HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-07-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-06-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-21HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback