US HB34 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to integrate water considerations into its energy research, development, and demonstration programs and projects. Specifically, the DOE must develop and implement a strategic plan that (1) advances energy and energy efficiency technologies and practices to minimize freshwater withdrawal and consumption, increase water use efficiency, and utilize nontraditional water sources; (2) considers the effects climate variability may have on water supplies and quality for energy generation and fuel production; and (3) improves the understanding of the energy required to provide reliable water supplies as well as the water required to provide reliable energy supplies. The plan must be updated every five years. In addition, DOE must establish an Energy-Water Subcommittee of the Energy Advisory Board to promote and enable improved energy and water resource data collection, reporting, and technological innovation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy and Water Research Integration Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-07-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7177-7178)
2019-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 34.
2019-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7177-7179)
2019-07-23HouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback