US HB340 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide the same level of Federal matching assistance for every State that chooses to expand Medicaid coverage to newly eligible individuals, regardless of when such expansion takes place.
Title
Incentivizing Medicaid Expansion Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB245 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB352 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4974 (Related) 2021-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2639 (Related) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB352 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4974 (Related) 2021-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2639 (Related) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/340/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr340/BILLS-117hr340ih.pdf |