US HB3402 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fruit and Vegetable Access for Children Act This bill amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to allow federal grant-funded fresh fruit and vegetable programs carried out by states to include canned, dried, frozen, or pureed fruits and vegetables.
Title
Fruit and Vegetable Access for Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Fruit and vegetables
Elementary and secondary education
Food assistance and relief
Fruit and vegetables
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3402/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3402/BILLS-115hr3402ih.pdf |