US HB3405 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to remove uranium from the critical minerals list. (A "critical mineral" is a nonfuel mineral or mineral material that is essential to economic and national security, from a supply chain that is vulnerable to disruption, and that serves an essential function in the manufacturing of a product, the absence of which would have significant consequences for the U.S. economy or national security.)
Title
Uranium Classification Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178. |
2019-10-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-225. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-17 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Metals
Public lands and natural resources
Administrative remedies
Metals
Public lands and natural resources