US HB3421 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends funding through FY2022 for state health insurance programs, area agencies on aging, aging and disability resource centers, and technical assistance related to outreach and enrollment for benefit programs for low-income, older individuals.
Title
Fair Choices for Medicare Beneficiaries Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3417 (Similar To) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
SB3001 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3417 (Similar To) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
SB3001 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Aging
Disability assistance
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicare
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Disability assistance
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicare
State and local finance
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3421/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3421/BILLS-116hr3421ih.pdf |