US HB3434 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to report annually on the status of private-led efforts to trace the origin of suspected unlawful robocalls and to list telecommunication service providers that have not sufficiently participated. The FCC shall also foster the establishment of a single consortium to conduct private-led efforts to trace the origin of suspected unlawful robocalls.
Title
Tracing Back and Catching Unlawful Robocallers Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3375 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Business records
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3434/BILLS-116hr3434ih.pdf |