US HB3436 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-646, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-646, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates cost-sharing for chronic care management services under Medicare.
Title
Chronic Care Management Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-646, Part I. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3436/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3436/BILLS-116hr3436ih.pdf |