US HB3442 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who engage in improper interference in a United States election are inadmissible and deportable, and for other purposes.
Title
DETER Act Defending Elections against Trolls from Enemy Regimes Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Subversive activities
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Subversive activities
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3442/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3442/BILLS-116hr3442ih.pdf |