US HB3443 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E971)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E971)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the regulatory framework with respect to certain nonprescription drugs that are marketed without an approved drug application, and for other purposes.
Title
Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E971) |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
SB2740 (Related) 2019-12-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB2740 (Related) 2019-12-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Cosmetics and personal care
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Cosmetics and personal care
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3443/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3443/BILLS-116hr3443ih.pdf |