US HB3460 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
States that it is U.S. policy to support a broad range of activities toward finding cost-effective treatment for, and eliminating, neglected tropical diseases in order to improve the economic and social well-being of all people. The bill defines neglected tropical diseases as those that disproportionately impact individuals living in extreme poverty, especially in developing countries, and includes Chagas disease, dengue fever, and leprosy.
Title
End Neglected Tropical Diseases Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9194-9195) |
2019-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3460. |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9194-9197) |
2019-12-03 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB826 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2481 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2481 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Africa
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Nutrition and diet
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
United Nations
Water quality
Women's health
World health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Nutrition and diet
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
United Nations
Water quality
Women's health
World health