US HB3467 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rescinds each Medal of Honor awarded for acts that occurred on December 29, 1890, at Wounded Knee Creek, Lakota Pine Ridge Indian Reservation, South Dakota. The bill requires the Army, Navy, Air Force, and Coast Guard to remove the names of those award recipients from the Medal of Honor Roll.
Title
Remove the Stain Act
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3164 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Federal-Indian relations
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Conflicts and wars
Federal-Indian relations
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3467/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3467/BILLS-116hr3467ih.pdf |