US HB3469 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes standards for the covert testing process that the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) uses to evaluate its aviation security operations. Specifically, the TSA must implement an internal, risk-informed covert testing process for aviation security operations that can yield statistically valid results; execute at least three covert testing projects each year that are designed to identify systemic vulnerabilities in the transportation security system; establish a system to address and mitigate the vulnerabilities identified and assessed pursuant to the testing process; compile a list of the vulnerabilities, including a brief description of the nature of each vulnerability; and report the status of the vulnerabilities to Congress as part of its annual budget submission.
Title
Covert Testing and Risk Mitigation Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9366) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3469. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9366-9367) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 240. |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-298. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security