US HB3501 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SECURE Our Democracy Act Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SECURE Our Democracy Act Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback