US HB3505 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gives the Department of Defense the authority to inspect a completed military-housing project developed and operated by a private developer.
Title
To amend title 10, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Defense to access and inspect privatized military housing units, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Government information and archives
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3505/BILLS-116hr3505ih.pdf |