US HB3510 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2023 the water resources research program and otherwise revises the program, including by increasing the federal share of grant funding under the program for water resources research and technology institutes.
Title
Water Resources Research Amendments Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] |
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2164 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3591 (Related) 2020-11-09 - An errata sheet on written report No. 116-288 was printed.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB3591 (Related) 2020-11-09 - An errata sheet on written report No. 116-288 was printed.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government studies and investigations
Research administration and funding
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government studies and investigations
Research administration and funding
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3510/BILLS-116hr3510ih.pdf |