US HB353 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual reports concerning Taiwan's participation at the World Health Organization's World Health Assembly (WHA) as an observer. The report shall describe changes and improvements to the State Department's plan to support Taiwan's observer status at the WHA, following any meetings at which Taiwan did not participate under such status. (China has opposed Taiwan's participation, based on its position that Taiwan is part of China and not a separate country.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-01-23HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E80-81)
2019-01-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H974)
2019-01-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 353.
2019-01-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H974-976)
2019-01-22HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB237 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
SB249 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback