US HB3535 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the work-study allowance program administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.
Title
GI Bill Work Study Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2265 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Higher education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3535/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3535/BILLS-116hr3535ih.pdf |