US HB3540 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes cannabis from the schedule of controlled substances, and it prohibits the Small Business Administration from declining to provide certain small business loans to an eligible entity solely because it is a cannabis-related legitimate business or service provider.
Title
Ensuring Safe Capital Access for All Small Businesses Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3884 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2227 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1244 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2227 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1244 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government lending and loan guarantees
Small business
State and local finance
Commerce
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government lending and loan guarantees
Small business
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3540/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3540/BILLS-116hr3540ih.pdf |