US HB3545 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 89-15)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes various grants within the Department of Justice for states and units of local government to improve law enforcement activities to address hate crimes, including by improving the reporting of hate crime data to relevant national systems. It also allows a court to order, as a penalty for a violation of a federal hate crime statute, a defendant to participate in educational classes or community service related to the community harmed by the defendant's offense as part of a supervised release.
Title
NO HATE Act National Opposition to Hate, Assault, and Threats to Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2043 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Hate crimes
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Hate crimes
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3545/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3545/BILLS-116hr3545ih.pdf |