US HB358 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 140-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Life Act - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) to prohibit federal funds from being to used to cover any part of the costs of any health plan that includes coverage of abortion services. (Currently, federal funds cannot be used for abortion services and plans receiving federal funds must keep federal funds segregated from any funds for abortion services.) Requires any qualified health benefit plan offered through an Exchange that includes coverage for abortions to also offer a qualified health benefit plan through the Exchange that is identical in every respect except that it does not cover abortions. Prohibits a federal agency or program and any state or local government that receives federal financial assistance under PPACA from requiring any health plan created or regulated under PPACA to discriminate against any institutional or individual health care entity based on the entity's refusal to undergo training in the performance of induced abortions, require or provide such training, or refer for such training. Creates a cause of action for any violations of the abortion provisions of PPACA. Gives federal courts jurisdiction to prevent and redress actual or threatened violations of such provisions by issuing any form of legal or equitable relief, including injunctions and orders preventing the disbursement of all or a portion of federal financial assistance until the prohibited conduct has ceased. Gives standing to institute an action to affected health care entities and the Attorney General. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to designate the Director of the Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to receive and investigate complaints alleging a violation of PPACA abortion provisions. Requires the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to ensure that no multistate qualified health plan offered in an Exchange provides coverage of abortion services.
Title
Protect Life Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-13 - House - On Passage (Y: 251 N: 172 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-13 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 173 N: 249 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-10-13 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 173 N: 249 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2011-10-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-10-13 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 251 - 172 (Roll no. 789). (text: CR H6886) |
2011-10-13 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 173 - 249 (Roll no. 788). |
2011-10-13 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6903) |
2011-10-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Capps motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions in the motion seek to report the same to the House with an amendment to add language stating that no hospital or health care provider can be exempted from any Federal or State law that requires them to provide any medical examination, treatment, referral, or transfer to prevent the death of a pregnant woman with an emergency medical condition. |
2011-10-13 | House | Mrs. Capps moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H6901-6903; text: CR H6901) |
2011-10-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6901) |
2011-10-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 358. |
2011-10-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 358 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Energy and Commerce now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. |
2011-10-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 430. (consideration: CR H6885-6903) |
2011-10-13 | House | Rule H. Res. 430 passed House. |
2011-10-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 430 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 358 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Energy and Commerce now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. |
2011-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133. |
2011-09-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2011-09-09 | House | House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 12, 2011. |
2011-05-20 | House | House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 9, 2011. |
2011-04-15 | House | House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 20, 2011. |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Ways and Means for a period ending not later than April 15, 2011 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(t), rule X. |
2011-03-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-40, Part I. |
2011-02-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 9. |
2011-02-11 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2011-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB877 (Related) 2011-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR430 (Related) 2011-10-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR430 (Related) 2011-10-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Abortion
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of Health and Human Services
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical ethics
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Department of Health and Human Services
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical ethics