US HB3596 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Keep America's Waterfronts Working Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep America's Waterfronts Working Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-15HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 238.
2019-11-15HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-295.
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-07-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-07-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback