US HB36 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 96-7)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Combating Sexual Harassment in Science Act of 2019 This bill addresses sexual harassment and gender harassment in the science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) fields by supporting research regarding such harassment and efforts to prevent and respond to such harassment. This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to award grants to institutions of higher education or nonprofit organizations (or their consortia) to expand research into sexual harassment and gender harassment in the STEM workforce, including students and trainees; and examine interventions for reducing the incidence and negative consequences of such harassment. The NSF must convene a working group composed of representatives of federal statistical agencies to develop questions on sexual harassment and gender harassment in STEM departments in order to gather national data on the prevalence, nature, and implications of such harassment in institutions of higher education. The NSF shall enter into agreements with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine to (1) update a responsible conduct guide issued by the National Academies to include, among other things, updated professional standards of conduct in research and evidence-based practices for fostering a climate that is intolerant of sexual harassment and gender harassment; and (2) study the influence of such harassment in institutions of higher education on the career advancement of individuals in the STEM workforce. The National Science and Technology Council shall establish an interagency working group to coordinate the federal science agencies' efforts to reduce the prevalence of sexual harassment and gender harassment involving grant personnel. The Office of Science and Technology Policy must develop a uniform set of policy guidelines for such agencies to prevent and respond to reports of sexual harassment and gender harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combating Sexual Harassment in Science Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2019-07-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7173-7175)
2019-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 36.
2019-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7173-7176)
2019-07-23HouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 115.
2019-07-12HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-153.
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback