US HB3607 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fossil Energy Research and Development Act of 2019 This bill expands Department of Energy (DOE) research, development, and demonstration programs for fossil energy. Among other things, the bill authorizes DOE programs regarding carbon capture technologies for power plants, including technologies for coal and natural gas; carbon storage, including to develop and maintain mapping tools and resources that assess the capacity of geologic storage formations in the United States; carbon utilization, including to assess and monitor potential changes in life cycle carbon dioxide and other greenhouse gas emissions; advanced energy systems to reduce emissions from and improve the efficiency of fossil fuel power generation; developing and assessing methods to separate and recover rare earth elements from coal and byproduct streams; identifying the environmental, health, and safety impacts of methane hydrate development; carbon dioxide removal from the atmosphere; methane leak detection and mitigation; and identifying and evaluating novel uses for light hydrocarbons produced during oil and shale gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fossil Energy Research and Development Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
2020-09-17HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-510.
2019-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
2019-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 7 - 5 .
2019-07-10HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-07-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-07-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2659 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3828 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback