US HB3612 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act (FAST Act) to repeal the permanent rescission on July 1, 2020, of $7.569 billion in unobligated federal-aid highway funds for states.
Title
To repeal a section of the FAST Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-07-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1992 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3612/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3612/BILLS-116hr3612ih.pdf |