US HB3619 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to real estate appraisals. Specifically, the bill adds trainee appraisers to the National Registry of Appraisers, allows the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council's Appraisal Subcommittee to adjust annual registry fees for appraisal management companies, requires the disclosure of appraisal fees in the case of an appraisal coordinated by an appraisal management company, allows nonprofit organizations and institutions of higher education to receive certain grants, and adds a designee of the Department of Veterans Affairs to the Appraisal Subcommittee.
Title
Appraisal Fee Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7804) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3619. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7803-7805) |
2019-09-19 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Veterans Affairs
Higher education
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Licensing and registrations
Real estate business
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Veterans Affairs
Higher education
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Licensing and registrations
Real estate business
State and local government operations
User charges and fees