US HB3620 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide rental assistance to low-income tenants in certain multifamily rural housing projects financed by the Rural Housing Service of the Department of Agriculture, and to develop and implement a plan for preserving the affordability of rural rental housing, and for other purposes.
Title
Strategy and Investment in Rural Housing Preservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7573-7574) |
2019-09-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3620. |
2019-09-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7573-7576) |
2019-09-10 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156. |
2019-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-198. |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0. |
2019-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1310 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4916 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5038 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB4916 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5038 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Low- and moderate-income housing
Performance measurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Sex offenses
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Low- and moderate-income housing
Performance measurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Sex offenses