US HB3623 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to require an issuer of securities to annually disclose information regarding climate change-related risks posed to the issuer, including an issuer's strategies and actions to mitigate these risks. Among other things, issuers must (1) report their direct and indirect greenhouse-gas emissions, (2) disclose their fossil fuel-related assets, and (3) establish standards regarding the social cost of carbon.
Title
Climate Risk Disclosure Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461. |
2020-10-27 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-10-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-563, Part I. |
2019-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25. |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2075 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Business records
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Water use and supply
Air quality
Business records
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Water use and supply