US HB3625 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a whistleblower protection program at the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board (PCAOB). Specifically, individuals reporting information to the PCAOB regarding securities law violations relating to audits (1) are protected from retaliation by an employer, and (2) could be eligible for a monetary reward. The reward program applies to individuals who voluntarily report original information that results in the PCAOB imposing civil penalties exceeding $250,000.
Title
PCAOB Whistleblower Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7800-7802) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3625. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7800-7803) |
2019-09-19 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Civil actions and liability
Corporate finance and management
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Securities
Civil actions and liability
Corporate finance and management
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Securities