US HB3661 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows, and regulates the amount of, housing assistance payable to certain post-9/11 veterans (and, in some instances, those veterans' spouses, children, or both) who are pursuing distance learning.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a monthly housing stipend under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program for individuals pursuing programs of education offered through distance learning, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-02 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-10-01 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10436) | |
2009-09-29 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3467 (Related) 2009-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational technology and distance education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Educational technology and distance education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3661/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3661/BILLS-111hr3661ih.pdf |