US HB3661 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Access to Public Land Guarantee Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), with respect to land under their respective jurisdictions, pursuant to a state or local government offer, to enter into an agreement under which the United States may accept funds from the state or local government to reopen any unit of the National Park System, the National Wildlife Refuge System, or the National Forest System within the state or local government during any period in which there is a lapse in available funds for that unit as a result of a failure to enact a regular appropriations bill or continuing resolution. Makes such authority effective only during a period in which the Secretary is unable to operate and manage covered units at normal levels. Requires the appropriate Secretary to refund to the state or local government all amounts it provided to the United States under such an agreement: (1) upon enactment of an Act retroactively appropriating amounts sufficient to maintain normal operating levels at the reopened covered unit, or (2) on the date on which the state or local government establishes that the Secretary collected entrance or user fees for the covered units during the period in which the agreement was in effect. Allows the appropriate Secretary, if such refund requirements are not met, to reimburse the state or local government voluntarily for any amounts it provided to the United States under such an agreement.
Title
Public Access to Public Land Guarantee Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1750 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 635.
Subjects
Appropriations
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3661/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3661/BILLS-113hr3661ih.pdf |