US HB3661 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New England Fishermen Preservation Act This bill prohibits the Department of Commerce from requiring sectors of the Northeast Multispecies Fishery to comply with the independent, third-party monitoring program, unless the program is fully funded by the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. The program monitors annual catch limits for fishing vessels in that sector. Currently, those sectors are required to develop and implement those programs, and are responsible for the program costs.
Title
New England Fishermen Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-10-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6821-6822) |
2015-10-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-10-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2047 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Atlantic Ocean
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3661/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3661/BILLS-114hr3661ih.pdf |