US HB3661 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Patriotic Employer Protection Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patriotic Employer Protection Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
2019-11-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8800)
2019-11-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3661.
2019-11-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8800-8802)
2019-11-13HouseMr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-15HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
2019-10-15HouseReported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-234.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2019-07-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback