US HB3669 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security to develop and conduct a collective-response-to-terrorism exercise that includes managing cascading effects on critical infrastructure, such as an extreme cold-weather event caused by a polar vortex.
Title
Weatherizing Infrastructure in the North and Terrorism Emergency Readiness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9377) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3669. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9377-9378) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249. |
2019-11-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-308. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Public utilities and utility rates
Terrorism
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Public utilities and utility rates
Terrorism