US HB3674 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates origination fees on future federal student loans. Origination fees are the fees lenders charge for processing new loan applications.
Title
Eliminating the Hidden Student Loan Tax Act
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1899 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1696 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1696 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2065 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1002 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3674/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3674/BILLS-116hr3674ih.pdf |