US HB3680 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-232. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-232. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 415 North Main Street in Henning, Tennessee, as the "Paula Croom Robinson and Judy Spray Memorial Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 415 North Main Street in Henning, Tennessee as the "Paula Robinson and Judy Spray Memorial Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] |
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-232. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5071) |
2020-09-30 | House | H.Amdt.896 On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | H.Amdt.896 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Connolly. (consideration: CR H5071; text: CR H5071) |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5071) |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Tennessee
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Tennessee