US HB3681 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy (DOE), the Forest Service, and the National Park Service (NPS) (appropriate agencies) to collaborate on the Green Spaces, Green Vehicles Initiative to facilitate the installation and use of zero-emissions vehicle infrastructure on National Forest System lands, NPS lands, and specified lands owned by units of local government or Indian tribes. DOE and such appropriate agencies shall facilitate such installation and use, including by acquiring zero-emissions vehicles for the fleets of the Forest Service and the NPS. For purposes of determining whether the acquisition of alternative fueled vehicles is practical for the fleet of the Forest Service or the NPS, DOE shall take into account the availability on National Forest System land or NPS land, as applicable, of zero-emissions vehicle infrastructure.
Title
Green Spaces, Green Vehicles Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2041 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Infrastructure development
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Forests, forestry, trees
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Infrastructure development
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3681/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3681/BILLS-116hr3681ih.pdf |