US HB3691 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to develop a plan to ensure that TSA material disseminated in major airports is better understood by people accessing such airports, including by foreign language speakers and people with vision or hearing impairments. In developing a plan, the TSA must take into consideration data regarding international enplanement and local populations surrounding major airports.
Title
TRANSLATE Act TSA Reaching Across Nationalities, Societies, and Languages to Advance Traveler Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8019) |
2019-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3691. |
2019-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8019-8020) |
2019-09-26 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-09-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 158. |
2019-09-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-201. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disability assistance
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Transportation and public works
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disability assistance
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Transportation and public works